+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On November 18, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 6
On October 29, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On October 28, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III
- Placed on cal. Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar
On October 27, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On October 26, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (18)
+ − Votes (2)
October 28, 2021: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE OF EXTRAORDINARY SESSION III:
October 28, 2021: COVID-19 COMMITTEE OF EXTRAORDINARY SESSION III: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III
+ − Sponsor
C. Sexton
Type:
Primary Sponsor