+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (32)
On November 18, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 11/12/2021
- Pub. Ch. 4
On November 12, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by Governor without signature.
On November 1, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On November 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On November 1, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
- Signed by H. Speaker
On October 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee report adopted (CC9003)
On October 30, 2021 in the House:
- Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 67, Nays 14 PNV 1
On October 29, 2021 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA9006)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 67, Nays 23, PNV 2
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA9006)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 6
On October 29, 2021 in the House:
- H. nonconcurred in S. am. no. SA9006 HB9076
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate refused to recede from its non-concurrence.
On October 29, 2021 in the House:
- H. refused to recede from its non-concurrence in SA1
- Conf. comm. appointed. (Vaughan, Hazlewood, Grills, Windle)
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee appointed. (Massey, Jackson, Rose, Kyle, Gardenhire)
On October 29, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Message Calendar for 10/29/21
On October 28, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Public Health Committee of Extraordinary Session III
- Placed on cal. Public Health Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session III
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar
On October 27, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On October 26, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
October 30, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
October 30, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 69
- Present/NV: 2
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 2 BY HARDAWAY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 69
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 69
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 69
- Present/NV: 2
October 28, 2021: PUBLIC HEALTH COMMITTEE OF EXTRAORDINARY SESSION III: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session III
October 28, 2021: FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE OF EXTRAORDINARY SESSION III: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III
October 28, 2021: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE OF EXTRAORDINARY SESSION III:
+ − Sponsor
C. Sexton
Type:
Primary Sponsor