+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On November 18, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 11/12/2021
- Pub. Ch. 3
On November 12, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On November 1, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On November 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On November 1, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
- Signed by H. Speaker
On October 29, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 76, Nays 14, PNV 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Passed Senate, Ayes 24, Nays 5
On October 28, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Emergency Orders Committee of Extraordinary Session III
- Placed on cal. Emergency Orders Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar
On October 27, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On October 26, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
October 28, 2021: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE OF EXTRAORDINARY SESSION III:
October 28, 2021: EMERGENCY ORDERS COMMITTEE OF EXTRAORDINARY SESSION III:
+ − Sponsor
C. Sexton
Type:
Primary Sponsor