+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On November 18, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 11/12/2021
- Pub. Ch. 1
On November 12, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On November 1, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On November 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On November 1, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
- Signed by H. Speaker
On October 29, 2021 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA9001)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 5 - HA9014)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 52, Nays 39, PNV 2
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA9002)
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA9009)
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA9001)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 20, Nays 10
On October 29, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Message Calendar for 10/29/21
- H. concurred in S. am. no. SA9002 and SA9009 Ayes 57, Nays 23 PNV 4 HB9072
On October 28, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Elections Committee of Extraordinary Session III
- Placed on cal. Elections Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar
On October 27, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On October 26, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Votes (11)
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 5 BY CEPICKY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 6 BY HARDAWAY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR 2 & 3 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY CEPICKY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 2 BY MITCHELL PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 3 BY MCKENZIE PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
October 28, 2021: ELECTIONS COMMITTEE OF EXTRAORDINARY SESSION III: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
October 28, 2021: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE OF EXTRAORDINARY SESSION III:
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
C. Sexton
Type:
Primary Sponsor