+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On November 18, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 5
On October 29, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On October 28, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee of Extraordinary Session III
- Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session III
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar
On October 27, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On October 26, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
October 28, 2021: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE OF EXTRAORDINARY SESSION III:
October 28, 2021: FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE OF EXTRAORDINARY SESSION III: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III
October 28, 2021: JUDICIARY COMMITTEE OF EXTRAORDINARY SESSION III: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session III
+ − Sponsor
C. Sexton
Type:
Primary Sponsor