+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 553
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2018
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- H. concurred in S. am. no. 2 Ayes 96, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB0902
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Message Calendar for 2/26/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0356)
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0563)
- Move to Heel
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0348)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Passed H., Ayes 84, Nays 1, PNV 1
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2017
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 4/11/2017
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Action def. in Education Instruction & Programs to 4/11/2017
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 4/4/2017
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
February 26, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 1
February 5, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 9
April 20, 2017: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 20, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 1
April 20, 2017: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 11, 2017: EDUCATION INSTRUCTION & PROGRAMS: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 11, 2017: HOUSE EDUCATION INSTRUCTION & PROGRAMS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 29, 2017: HOUSE EDUCATION INSTRUCTION & PROGRAMS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
March 29, 2017: EDUCATION INSTRUCTION & PROGRAMS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
+ − Sponsors (3)
Kumar
Type:
Primary Sponsor