+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On October 29, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/29/2021
- No action taken
On October 28, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Elections Committee of Extraordinary Session III
- Placed on cal. Elections Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021
- Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III
On October 27, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On October 21, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
October 28, 2021: ELECTIONS COMMITTEE OF EXTRAORDINARY SESSION III: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor