+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor change.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor change.
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Reset on Final cal. of Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/15/2017
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor