+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (33)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/18
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2018
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/27/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/21/2018
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor change.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor change.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
- Meeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/22/17
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/15/2017
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/15/2017
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/8/2017
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (4)
March 27, 2018: HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 27, 2018: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 21, 2018: HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
March 21, 2018: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor