+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 439
- Effective date(s) 05/22/2019
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0376)
- Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 1, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0326)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education for 4/10/2019
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
- Ref. to Education
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 30, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
April 22, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 22, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 1