+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/15/2015
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/15/2015
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
April 15, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 15, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 15, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor