+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/4/2020
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/04/2020
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 1/28/2020
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2020
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor