+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 32
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/4/2013
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/28/2013
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/27/2013
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/20/2013
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.