+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 94
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/30/2015
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/26/2015
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/24/2015
- Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/18/2015
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/10/2015
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 17, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
- Ref. to Health Committee--Government Operations for review
- P2C held on desk pending appointment of standing committees
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (10)
March 30, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
March 30, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
March 30, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
March 30, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Present/NV: 3