+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 258
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2017
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/11/2017
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/29/2017
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/21/2017
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Action def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to 3/21/2017
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/14/2017
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/8/2017
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee-- Government Operations for Review
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (12)
April 20, 2017: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 20, 2017: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 11, 2017: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 11, 2017: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 5, 2017: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 5, 2017: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 29, 2017: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 29, 2017: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 21, 2017: HOUSE INSURANCE AND BANKING: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
March 21, 2017: INSURANCE AND BANKING COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
March 8, 2017: HOUSE INSURANCE AND BANKING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
March 8, 2017: INSURANCE AND BANKING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor