+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2013
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Placed Behind the Budget
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2013
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/26/2013
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/20/2013
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
March 26, 2013: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE
March 20, 2013: LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor