+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/31/2015
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
- Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/25/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/18/2015
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
March 25, 2015: LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
March 25, 2015: LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor