+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 204
- Effective date(s) 04/27/2017
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0347)
- Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 4, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0247)
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2017
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/6/2017
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/28/2017
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Action def. in Education Administration & Planning to 3/28/2017
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/21/2017
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/14/2017
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/14/2017
- Move to Heel
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/7/2017
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/7/2017
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/28/2017
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 2/28/2017
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/21/2017
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
April 13, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 9
April 10, 2017: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 10, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 4
April 10, 2017: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 28, 2017: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 28, 2017: HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 14, 2017: HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
March 14, 2017: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor