+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 37
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/4/2019
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/28/2019
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 2/26/2019
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
March 4, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 2
March 4, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
February 26, 2019: EDINST: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 26, 2019: HOUSE NAMING, DESIGNATING, & PRIVATE ACTS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor