+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 311
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary for 4/10/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2019
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 22, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 17, 2019: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 17, 2019: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
April 9, 2019: HOUSE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
April 2, 2019: HOUSE CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
DeBerry
Type:
Primary Sponsor