+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Business and Utilities Committee
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/30/2016
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Action def. in Business and Utilities Committee to 2016
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 4/8/2015
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/31/2015
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/31/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/24/2015
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/24/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/17/2015
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee--Government Operataions for review
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
March 31, 2015: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
March 31, 2015: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor