+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Failed in Education Administration & Planning
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/11/2017
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Action def. in Education Administration & Planning to 4/11/2017
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/4/2017
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/28/2017
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning-- Government Operations for Review
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 11, 2017: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Failed in Education Administration & Planning
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 7
April 11, 2017: HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING COMMITTEE: Failed in Education Administration & Planning
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 7