+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 221
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0283)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0059)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2019
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/12/2019
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
- Refer. to State Committee
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 15, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
March 21, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
March 21, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 12, 2019: HOUSE STATE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 6, 2019: HOUSE PUBLIC SERVICE & EMPLOYEES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor