+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 69
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2013
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed S., Ayes 33, Nays 0
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0061)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/7/2013
- Objected to on Consent Calendar.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/4/2013
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/28/2013
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/27/2013
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/19/2013
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0061
Amendment 1-0 to HB0085
+ − Votes (4)
March 18, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 33
March 7, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95