+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Failed In s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/20/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 20, 2013: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor