+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 168
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/16/2021
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/16/2021
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/9/2021
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass if am. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 3/2/2021
On February 20, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 22, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 16, 2021: HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 2, 2021: HOUSE CORRECTIONS SUBCOMMITTEE:
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor