+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 04/22/2021
- Pub. Ch. 217
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/8/2021
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/4/2021
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/2/2021
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/24/2021
- Meeting Canceled
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/17/2021
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- P2C held on desk.
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (5)
April 5, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 11
March 8, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94