+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2016
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/30/2016
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2015
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/7/2015
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 4/1/2015
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/25/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/24/2015
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/24/2015
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/17/2015
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/17/2015
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/10/2015
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 7, 2015: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 7, 2015: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 1, 2015: AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
April 1, 2015: AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
March 24, 2015: AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
March 24, 2015: AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor