+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 20, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 7, 2015: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 1, 2015: HOUSE AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
March 24, 2015: HOUSE AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor