+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
- Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 4/6/2021
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 4/6/2021
- Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
- Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 3/30/2021
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/23/2021
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 20, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor