+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 248
- Effective date(s) 04/24/2015
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0396)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0283)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2015
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 4/1/2015
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/24/2015
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
April 14, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 32
April 13, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 13, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 13, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 13, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
April 13, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
April 1, 2015: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 1, 2015: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 24, 2015: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
March 24, 2015: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor