+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/7/2017
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/7/2017
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/28/2017
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor