+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 2/2/2022
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2022
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/24/2021
On February 20, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor