+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 322
- Effective date(s) 05/08/2019
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0256)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0211)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/27/2019
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Committee
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 22, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
April 18, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 98
April 18, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 27, 2019: HOUSE LOCAL COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 20, 2019: HOUSE PROPERTY & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Committee
March 21, 2007: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Commerce Committee
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor