+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 236
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2015
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0, PNV 1
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/6/2015
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/2/2015
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/24/2015
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/18/2015
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (9)
April 8, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 1
April 6, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 6, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 6, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 6, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
March 24, 2015: CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 24, 2015: CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 18, 2015: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
March 18, 2015: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor