+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 62
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/15/2021
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/11/2021
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/3/2021
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/23/2021
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/16/2021
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Ref. to Health Committee
- P2C held on desk.
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 88
- Present/NV: 1