+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 436
- Effective date(s) 01/01/2020
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0204)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0050)
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/6/2019
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Meeting Adjourned
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/19/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 30, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
April 30, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95