+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 31
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/4/2013
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/28/2013
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/26/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
March 4, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
February 28, 2013: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
February 26, 2013: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor