+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 87, Nays 7
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0002)
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/21/2013
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/14/2013
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/12/2013
- P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0002
Amendment 1-0 to HB0796
+ − Votes (3)
February 21, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 7