+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 82
- Effective date(s) 04/01/2013
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed S., Ayes 33, Nays 0
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/11/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2013
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/5/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
March 18, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 33
March 11, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
March 5, 2013: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor