+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 378
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2015
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 4/1/2015
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/24/2015
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/24/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/17/2015
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 13, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 13, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 13, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 1, 2015: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 1, 2015: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 24, 2015: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
March 24, 2015: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor