+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 205
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/15/2021
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/11/2021
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Instruction for 3/10/2021
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/2/2021
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 20, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Instruction
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 10, 2021: HOUSE EDUCATION INSTRUCTION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor