+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 3, 2023 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 04/28/2023
- Pub. Ch. 310
On April 28, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 20, 2023 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 18, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 13, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0372)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 23, 2023 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0124)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/23/2023
On March 15, 2023 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/16/2023
On March 14, 2023 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 9, 2023 in the House:
- Sponsor change.
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- Sponsor change.
- Placed on cal. Education Instruction for 3/14/2023
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Instruction
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/7/2023
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee to 3/7/2023
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 2/21/2023
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee
On February 2, 2023 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Instruction
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 12, 2023: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
March 23, 2023: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
March 23, 2023: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 14, 2023: HOUSE EDUCATION INSTRUCTION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 7, 2023: HOUSE EDUCATION INSTRUCTION SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Instruction
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor