+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Action def. in Education Instruction & Programs to 2016
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 4/7/2015
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 4/1/2015
- Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 4/1/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
April 1, 2015: EDUCATION INSTRUCTION & PROGRAMS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
April 1, 2015: EDUCATION INSTRUCTION & PROGRAMS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
April 1, 2015: EDUCATION INSTRUCTION & PROGRAMS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor