+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 6/10/2020
On June 2, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 6/2/2020
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/17/2020
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee to 3/10/2020
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 3/3/2020
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Reassigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 2/18/2020
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee of Health Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
June 2, 2020: HOUSE HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
March 10, 2020: HOUSE FACILITIES, LICENSURE, & REGULATIONS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor