+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 286
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2017
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0421)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 1, PNV 2
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0027)
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/6/2017
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/2/2017
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/22/2017
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/14/2017
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
April 24, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 9
March 6, 2017: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 6, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 20
March 6, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 20
March 6, 2017: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
February 22, 2017: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 22, 2017: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 14, 2017: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
February 14, 2017: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor