+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 282
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2015; 01/01/2016
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0107)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0248)
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2015
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/2/2015
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 4/1/2015
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/18/2015
- Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 3/18/2015
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/11/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
April 16, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 31