+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 186
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2017
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/6/2017
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/2/2017
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 2/21/2017
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
- Roll 1 places
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 2/15/2017
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (7)
March 6, 2017: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 6, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
March 6, 2017: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
February 21, 2017: HOUSE INSURANCE AND BANKING: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 21, 2017: INSURANCE AND BANKING COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 15, 2017: INSURANCE AND BANKING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
February 15, 2017: HOUSE INSURANCE AND BANKING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor