+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/28/2017
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/21/2017
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee-- Government Operations for Review
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor