+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 203
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/15/2021
- Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/10/2021
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/2/2021
On February 20, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee -- Government Operations for Review
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Intro., P1C.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 25, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 18, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Roll 30 places
March 15, 2021: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 10, 2021: HOUSE AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee
March 2, 2021: HOUSE AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor